AlHarbi, Samah Moeedh H (CPSO#: 97062)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 17 Oct 2011 to 09 Jan 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 10 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2015