Al-Harfi, Ziad Ali Ahmed (CPSO#: 72155)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1998 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1999 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2000 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002