Al-Hayki, Maryam Mohamed Ali Mohamed (CPSO#: 78885)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2003 to 14 Apr 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Apr 2003 to 14 Apr 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Apr 2004 to 14 Apr 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Apr 2005 to 14 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2006