Al-Hebshi, Adnan Saleh Alawi (CPSO#: 77329)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 05 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2005