Al-Helal, Bassam Ahmed A A S (CPSO#: 74433)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 15 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 15 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2000 to 15 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2001 to 15 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2002 to 15 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2003 to 15 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005