Al-Humaid, Enas Ahmed Saleh Ibrahim (CPSO#: 74213)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2000 to 04 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2001