Al-Husari, Muhanad A Jalil (CPSO#: 84859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

90 Dundas Steet
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H2
Canada
Phone: (905) 690-1418
Fax: (905) 690-9862
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

318 Ontario street
St Catharines ON  L2R5L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 6820444
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

801 Eglinton Avenue west
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

230 Bertie St
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

260 Sugarloaf St
Port Colborne ON  L3K2N7
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018


Corporation Name: Al-Husari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Husari ( CPSO# 84859 )

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Business Address:
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Phone Number: (905) 682-0444

Business Address:
90 Dundas Street
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H2
Phone Number: (905) 690-1418

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHANAD A JALIL AL-HUSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HUSARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2009