Al-Hwiesh, Abdullah Khalaf Mohammed (CPSO#: 77770)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 22 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 04 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2004