Al-Janabi, Hasan Ahmad (CPSO#: 92862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 105
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 235-9220
Fax: (905) 235-9221
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hasan Al-Janabi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Janabi ( CPSO# 92862 )

Business Address:
679 Davis Drive
Unit 105
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 235-9220

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Hasan  Ahmad  Al-Janabi  may  practise  medicine independently in internal
            medicine, critical care medicine and respirology, only.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)