Al-Jasmi, Fatma Abdulbaqi Mohammed Saleh (CPSO#: 77883)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2008