AlJishi, Taher Hassan Bin Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 89352)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013