AlJohaney, Ahmed Abdulaziz Awad (CPSO#: 82274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Internal Medicine
King Abdulaziz University Hospital
P.O.Box 80215
Jeddah 21589
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966505501848
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

750 Great northern road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B0A8
Canada
Phone: (705)7593434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 29 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED ABDULAZIZ AWAD ALJOHANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALJOHANEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2005 to 15 May 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2009