AlJohani, Naif Ibrahim Bagi (CPSO#: 96284)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2011 to 26 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014