Al-Johani, Sameera Mohammed (CPSO#: 76799)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 03 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2002 to 03 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2003 to 03 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2004 to 03 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006