Al-Juaid, Alaa Mohammed N (CPSO#: 97001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2013 to 31 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013