Al-Kanani, Kanan Ahmed Saleh (CPSO#: 78776)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2003 to 07 Mar 2003
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2003 to 02 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 11 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 11 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2006