Al-Kassem, Anas (CPSO#: 81756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, German

Education:University of Damascus, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
223 West Street Upper
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S9
Phone: (226) 440-3055
Fax: (226) 440-3056
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: 9055697007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1148 Winston Churchill Blvd
Oakville ON  L6J 0A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-3066
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Kassem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Kassem ( CPSO# 81756 )

Business Address:
Upper Level
223 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S9
Phone Number: (226) 440-3055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAS AL-KASSEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KASSEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2004 to 21 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2010