Al-Kattan, Wael Manna (CPSO#: 73050)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 09 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 1999 to 09 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2000 to 09 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2001 to 09 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003