Al-Khaifi, Muna Said Abdullah (CPSO#: 104598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4168346925
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNA SAID ABDULLAH AL-KHAIFI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-KHAIFI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-KHAIFI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-KHAIFI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-KHAIFI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-KHAIFI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-KHAIFI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Nov 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Apr 2019
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2018