Al-Khaldi, Fawziah H S (CPSO#: 85342)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2008 to 18 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2008