Al-Khater, Suzan Abdullah Ali Eid (CPSO#: 84854)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 13 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 14 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008