AlKhawaja, Sana Abdulaziz Abdulla (CPSO#: 89460)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2011