AlKhenizan, Abdullah Hamad M (CPSO#: 72848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH HAMAD M ALKHENIZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHENIZAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2018