AlKhotani, Alaa Mohammad Ali (CPSO#: 90721)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 29 Jul 2009
PEAP - Resident - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2009 to 29 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2015