Al-Madni, Khalid Mohammad Siddique (CPSO#: 91990)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 13 Aug 2009 to 07 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 08 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 May 2012