Al-Mahr, Ghadah Mansour Ali (CPSO#: 93501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 16 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055259140 Ext. 22116
Fax: (905) 527 2707
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHADAH MANSOUR ALI AL-MAHR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-MAHR is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL-MAHR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-MAHR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-MAHR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-MAHR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-MAHR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jan 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2018 to 15 Apr 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2019