AlManea, AlJawhara Abdulatif (CPSO#: 92233)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 04 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011