Al-Masloom, Abdulmutalib Mohammed (CPSO#: 85261)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2006 to 04 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016