Al-Mayman, Talal Abdulaziz Ibrahim (CPSO#: 74082)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005