Al-Mogbil, Mohammad Hamad Naser (CPSO#: 73018)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003