Al-Mohammedi, Faisal Abdulmohsen Hassan (CPSO#: 91228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 303
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 625-5600
Fax: (905) 625-5650
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 12
9080 yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Mohammedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Mohammedi ( CPSO# 91228 )

Business Address:
303 - 1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (649) 997-6559

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 28 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAISAL ABDULMOHSEN HASSAN AL-MOHAMMEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MOHAMMEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011