Al-Muhaiteeb, Abdullah A M A M (CPSO#: 98421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH A M A M AL-MUHAITEEB may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL-MUHAITEEB is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-MUHAITEEB shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-MUHAITEEB is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-MUHAITEEB shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AL-MUHAITEEB ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. AL-MUHAITEEB ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018