Al-Musaed, Ahmed Musaed Faris (CPSO#: 78717)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 27 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 17 Apr 2003
PEAP - Resident - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Apr 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2005 to 20 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2006 to 20 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2007 to 20 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Apr 2008