Al-Nakhli, Mohammed Hamzah Salih (CPSO#: 80201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammed Al Nakhli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Nakhli ( CPSO# 80201 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HAMZAH SALIH AL-NAKHLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-NAKHLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2003 to 23 Dec 2003
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 24 Dec 2003 to 23 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 24 Dec 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Feb 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Feb 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 29 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013