AlNasser, Abdullah E A H (CPSO#: 95020)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 23 May 2011 to 17 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018