AlObthani, Murad Manea Salmeen Baquiri (CPSO#: 97439)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2012 to 29 May 2012
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 30 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017