Al-Otaibi, Ali Dhohyan Edeis Al Maqati (CPSO#: 91753)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013