Al-Ozairi, Abdullah S S S (CPSO#: 85985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Hospital 399 Bathurst Street Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 05 Aug 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH S S S AL-OZAIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-OZAIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 23 May 2007
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 May 2007 to 23 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 May 2008 to 23 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 May 2009 to 23 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 May 2011 to 23 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013