Al-Qadhi, Samim Aziz Arif (CPSO#: 85445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone: (519) 601-8621 Ext. 0
Fax: (519) 204-3122
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lucan Medical Center
268 Main St
P.O Box 310
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Canada
Phone: 519-227-1163
Fax: 519-227-1558
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samim Al-Qadhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Qadhi ( CPSO# 85445 )

Business Address:
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 601-8621

Business Address:
268 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Phone Number: (519) 227-1163

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIM AZIZ ARIF AL-QADHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-QADHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Jul 2011 to 12 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016