AlQahatani, Saad Ayed A (CPSO#: 90417)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 May 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2009 to 16 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2011 to 16 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016