AlQassmi, Amal Abdullah A (CPSO#: 96683)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015