AlQurashi, Waleed Daifallah Ataallah (CPSO#: 89672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Paed Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Fax: (613) 738-4885
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AlQurashi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. AlQurashi ( CPSO# 89672 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Paed Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALEED DAIFALLAH ATAALLAH ALQURASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQURASHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2008 to 03 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2013