Al-Radi, Osman Ossama Mohammad (CPSO#: 73155)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 23 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 1999 to 23 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010