Al-Rasheedy, Intisar Mohammed Obaidallah Ali (CPSO#: 94588)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2010 to 20 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012