Al-Rawi, Firas Adil Tawfiq (CPSO#: 89632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Tawfiq, Firas Adil (used until: 08 Jul 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rfe Gs 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sports Medicine, MI-STREAM Clinic,
Altum Health, KDT, 4th Floor,
Toronto Western Hospital,
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5092
Fax: (416) 603-5406
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Firas A.T. Al-Rawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Rawi ( CPSO# 89632 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
Room RFE GS 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Suite KDT 401
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5092

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 15 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FIRAS ADIL TAWFIQ AL-RAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-RAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2008 to 07 Oct 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2008 to 15 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2009 to 15 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2010 to 15 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013