Al-Saad, Khulood Khalifa Abdulla Ahmed (CPSO#: 77005)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2004