Al-Saeed, Eyad Fawzy (CPSO#: 75799)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2006 to 20 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2006