Al-Saigh, Basil Behnam (CPSO#: 86161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Finch Weston Family Health Organiza
2367 FInch Avenue West - Unit B
Toronto ON  M9M 2W8
Phone: (416) 900-6697
Fax: (416) 900-6041
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Medical
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C3C9
Canada
Phone: 905-770-9096
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Saigh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Al-Saigh ( CPSO# 86161 )

Business Address:
3992 Albert Street
Regina SK  S4S 3R1

Business Address:
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4

Business Address:
Finch Weston Medical Clinic
D1 - 3492 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9M 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 900-0696

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASIL BEHNAM AL-SAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAIGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 24 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010