Al-Sayegh, Mohammad A J M (CPSO#: 89736)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 11 Aug 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 11 Aug 2010 to 10 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2011