Al-Sehagi, Bander Nasser Mustafa (CPSO#: 72911)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 09 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 10 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000